NY A05014 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates as peace officers certain Ogdensburg Bridge and Port Authority security personnel specifically for such airport.
Title
Designates as peace officers certain Ogdensburg Bridge and Port Authority security personnel specifically for such airport.
Sponsors
Asm. Scott Gray [R] | Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] | Asm. Scott Bendett [R] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.154 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.154 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | print number 5014a |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | committed to codes |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.140 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.235 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04382 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 4382A