NY A04899 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers providing coverage of prescription drugs for opioid addiction, to provide coverage of such prescription drugs prescribed for the treatment of substance abuse disorder.
Title
Requires insurers providing coverage of prescription drugs for opioid addiction, to provide coverage of such prescription drugs prescribed for the treatment of substance abuse disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.296 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 4899c |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 4899b |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2018-04-06 | Assembly | print number 4899a |
2018-04-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07905 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 7905A