NY A04877 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in grand jury proceedings when following submission to a grand jury of a criminal charge or charges, the grand jury dismisses all charges presented or directs the district attorney to dismiss all charges or directs the DA to file in a local criminal court an application for disclosure of certain materials; authorizes the court to limit disclosure of certain items where there is a reasonable likelihood that such disclosure may lead to the identity of a witness who is not a public servant or expert witness; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that in grand jury proceedings when following submission to a grand jury of a criminal charge or charges, the grand jury dismisses all charges presented or directs the district attorney to dismiss all charges or directs the DA to file in a local criminal court an application for disclosure of certain materials; authorizes the court to limit disclosure of certain items where there is a reasonable likelihood that such disclosure may lead to the identity of a witness who is not a public servant or expert witness; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | recommitted to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.346 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.59 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |