NY A04849 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain retirement plan distributions for income tax purposes.
Title
Exempts certain retirement plan distributions for income tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4849a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.186 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.80 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.80 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06370 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 6370A