NY S06370 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 6370A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 6370A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain retirement plan distributions for income tax purposes.
Title
Exempts certain retirement plan distributions for income tax purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6370A |
2020-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04849 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE