NY A04833 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - print number 4833a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - print number 4833a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the North Country Craft Beer Trails.
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the North Country Craft Beer Trails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Assembly | print number 4833a |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01914 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to transportation