NY A04823 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voting rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voting rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2020-01-17Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-03-01Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-08Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S04821 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback