NY A04817 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical amends to the constitution to allow for the electronic display of bills at members desk.
Title
Makes technical amends to the constitution to allow for the electronic display of bills at members desk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-04-25 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2011-02-09 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |