NY A04778 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.359
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.359
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the Penn Yan fire department length of service award program.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the Penn Yan fire department length of service award program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.359 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.883 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3913A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.346 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.346 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | print number 4778a |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03913 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4778A