NY A04740 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the green roof tax abatement; authorizes a tax abatement for any tax year commencing on or after July 1, 2019 and ending on or before June 30, 2024, which shall be fifteen dollars per square foot of a green roof; provides that the amount of such tax abatement shall not exceed $200,000.
Title
Relates to the green roof tax abatement; authorizes a tax abatement for any tax year commencing on or after July 1, 2019 and ending on or before June 30, 2024, which shall be fifteen dollars per square foot of a green roof; provides that the amount of such tax abatement shall not exceed $200,000.
Sponsors
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.79 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.346 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a4740b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5554B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1345 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5554A |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5554b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.346 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.346 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 4740b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | print number 4740a |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05554 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.79