NY A04725 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-17)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - print number 4725a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - print number 4725a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a personal income tax deduction for school supplies paid for out-of-pocket by K-12 teachers in public and nonpublic schools, up to $500 per year.
Title
Provides for a personal income tax deduction for school supplies paid for out-of-pocket by K-12 teachers in public and nonpublic schools, up to $500 per year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Assembly | print number 4725a |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04615 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - referred to ways and means