NY A04675 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Columbia to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Theodore Blank, a deputy sheriff employed by such county.
Title
Authorizes the county of Columbia to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Theodore Blank, a deputy sheriff employed by such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4404 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.551 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04404 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - SIGNED CHAP.811