NY A04660 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Alex R. Jimenez New York state military immigrant family legacy program within the division of veterans' services.
Title
Establishes the Alex R. Jimenez New York state military immigrant family legacy program within the division of veterans' services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.153 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.757 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.757 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | print number 4660a |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | reference changed to veterans' affairs |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04710 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS