NY A04648 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts the regional labor force cost index for the Hudson Valley region for the 2022-2023 school year and thereafter.
Title
Adjusts the regional labor force cost index for the Hudson Valley region for the 2022-2023 school year and thereafter.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Lawler [R] | Asm. Michael Durso [R] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | print number 4648a |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08488 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION