NY A04646 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 4646a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - print number 4646a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to child proofing liquid detergent packets.
Title
Relates to child proofing liquid detergent packets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Assembly | print number 4646a |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00100 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 100A