NY A04644 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates certain officers of the police department of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey as detectives.
Title
Designates certain officers of the police department of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey as detectives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.227 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3523 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.147 |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03523 (Same As) 2015-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4644