NY A04570 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing education and outreach programs related to home visiting programs which provide support for pregnant and parenting families, and have been proven to improve outcomes for mothers, infants, and families; provides that such information shall include information on services available from such programs, eligibility, and relevant contact information.
Title
Relates to providing education and outreach programs related to home visiting programs which provide support for pregnant and parenting families, and have been proven to improve outcomes for mothers, infants, and families; provides that such information shall include information on services available from such programs, eligibility, and relevant contact information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-04-05 | Assembly | print number 4570a |
2024-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | referred to health |