NY A04515 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including information concerning repayment of outstanding loans in the standard financial aid award letter.
Title
Relates to including information concerning repayment of outstanding loans in the standard financial aid award letter.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Christopher Eachus [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | print number 4515a |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S01137 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - referred to banks