NY A04503 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - amended on third reading 4503a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - amended on third reading 4503a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects the Long Island Power Authority and power purchase agreements with third parties to the provisions of the freedom of information law.
Title
Subjects the Long Island Power Authority and power purchase agreements with third parties to the provisions of the freedom of information law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4503a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.118 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.118 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02042 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 2042A