NY A04421 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.303
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.303
Summary
Relates to the development of joint municipal economic development areas in the city of Gloversville and the town of Johnstown and provides for the determination of property tax rates for property owners in such areas.
Title
Relates to the development of joint municipal economic development areas in the city of Gloversville and the town of Johnstown and provides for the determination of property tax rates for property owners in such areas.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | signed chap.303 | |
2009-07-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.834 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5840 | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | home rule request | |
2009-06-18 | home rule request | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.491 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.491 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-16 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-12 | print number 4421a | |
2009-06-12 | amend (t) and recommit to cities | |
2009-02-04 | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S05840 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.303
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04421&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |