NY A04412 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the public service commission the authority to regulate and certify providers, distributors and retailers of prepaid telephone calling services.
Title
Grants the public service commission the authority to regulate and certify providers, distributors and retailers of prepaid telephone calling services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |