NY A04375 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-38)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - print number 4375a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - print number 4375a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Department of Health to establish a certificate of recognition of stillbirth.
Title
Directs the department of health establish a certificate of recognition of stillbirth; provides such form shall be given to the parents of a stillborn child; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | print number 4375a | |
2010-07-06 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-06-14 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to health | |
2009-02-24 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-02-03 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S765-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH