NY A04356 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - print number 4356a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - print number 4356a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all outdoor advertising in cities of over 1,000,000 to be licensed by the department of transportation.
Title
Requires all outdoor advertising in cities of over 1,000,000 to be licensed by the department of transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Assembly | print number 4356a |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | reference changed to transportation |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S01141 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 1141A