NY A04348 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state 2020 complete count commission and provides for its powers and duties; requires the commission to identify the issues that led to the 2010 United States census undercount in New York state and makes recommendations to ensure an accurate count in the 2020 United States census.
Title
Establishes the New York state 2020 complete count commission and provides for its powers and duties; requires the commission to identify the issues that led to the 2010 United States census undercount in New York state and makes recommendations to ensure an accurate count in the 2020 United States census.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4348a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.330 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.517 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05809 (Same As) 2018-02-27 - PRINT NUMBER 5809A