NY A04338 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits automatic renewal of contracts for electronic and life safety alarm services.
Title
Permits automatic renewal of contracts for electronic and life safety alarm services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | print number 4338a |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05201 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - referred to judiciary