NY A04295 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-24 - print number 4295a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-24 - print number 4295a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits any investigator employed by the department of law to retire upon completion of twenty-five years of creditable service, regardless of age; provides that the benefit upon retirement would be an allowance of one-half of final average salary for twenty-five years of service.
Title
Permits any investigator employed by the department of law to retire upon completion of twenty-five years of creditable service, regardless of age; provides that the benefit upon retirement would be an allowance of one-half of final average salary for twenty-five years of service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | print number 4295a | |
2010-02-24 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-02-03 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S3717-A (Same As) 2010-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 3717A