NY A04278 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - committed to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - committed to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes out of state businesses engaged in the sale of prescriptions and registered with the education department, to deliver prescriptions to users off the premises of such businesses; provides that patient consent to off premises delivery of prescriptions shall be obtained in the same manner as provided under the federal Medicare Part D program.
Title
Authorizes out of state businesses engaged in the sale of prescriptions and registered with the education department, to deliver prescriptions to users off the premises of such businesses; provides that patient consent to off premises delivery of prescriptions shall be obtained in the same manner as provided under the federal Medicare Part D program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Assembly | committed to higher education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.174 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.144 |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | print number 4278a |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02661 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION