NY A04256 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the unearned income of a child when the parent or non-parent caregiver chooses to exclude such child from the public assistance household.
Title
Relates to the unearned income of a child when the parent or non-parent caregiver chooses to exclude such child from the public assistance household.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.164 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a4256a |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | AMENDED 4809A |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.734 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s4809a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.121 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | print number 4256a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S04809 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.164