NY A04218 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - print number 4218a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - print number 4218a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "vehicle lienholder accountability act"; requires lienholders to provide notice to the owner of the vehicle when such lienholder assigns his or her security interest and requires such lienholder to execute a release of his or her security interest, within ten days of such assignment.
Title
Establishes the "vehicle lienholder accountability act"; requires lienholders to provide notice to the owner of the vehicle when such lienholder assigns his or her security interest and requires such lienholder to execute a release of his or her security interest, within ten days of such assignment.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Assembly | print number 4218a |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06538 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - PRINT NUMBER 6538A