NY A04206 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-18)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to provide full coverage for the prevention, early detection, diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder; establishes an advisory panel on health insurance coverage for autism spectrum disorder to annually compile a list of treatments and therapy options for which health insurers will be required to provide coverage; establishes a toll-free, 24 hour a day, autism and health insurance coverage hotline to receive and act upon complaints and questions from families with autistic children, relating to insurance coverage for autism spectrum disorder.
Title
Requires health insurers to provide full coverage for the prevention, early detection, diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder; establishes an advisory panel on health insurance coverage for autism spectrum disorder to annually compile a list of treatments and therapy options for which health insurers will be required to provide coverage; establishes a toll-free, 24 hour a day, autism and health insurance coverage hotline to receive and act upon complaints and questions from families with autistic children, relating to insurance coverage for autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | print number 4206a |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03405 (Same As) 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3405A