NY A04204 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - to attorney-general for opinion
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - to attorney-general for opinion
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes religious observance as a cause for absentee voting.
Title
Authorizes religious observance as a cause for absentee voting.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | referred to election law |