NY A04204 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - signed chap.154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - signed chap.154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against religious attire and appurtenances thereto, including facial hair.
Title
Prohibits discrimination against religious attire and appurtenances thereto, including facial hair.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | signed chap.154 |
2019-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.272 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4037 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.31 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.31 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04037 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - signed chap.154