NY A04197 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-15 - print number 4197a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-15 - print number 4197a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows state university police officers to transfer to the NYSLPFRS and to be covered by the provisions of a new 25 year half pay retirement plan, with additional one-sixtieths of final average salary for each year of service in excess of twenty-five years, but not exceeding fifteen such years; provides that for tier 2 & 5 members, the additional one-sixtieths can not exceed seven such years.
Title
Allows state university police officers to transfer to the NYSLPFRS and to be covered by the provisions of a new 25 year half pay retirement plan, with additional one-sixtieths of final average salary for each year of service in excess of twenty-five years, but not exceeding fifteen such years; provides that for tier 2 & 5 members, the additional one-sixtieths can not exceed seven such years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | Assembly | print number 4197a |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |