NY A04194 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - print number 4194a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - print number 4194a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a bicycle and pedestrian safety component to the pre-licensing driver's education course.
Title
Adds a bicycle and pedestrian safety component to the pre-licensing driver's education course.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Assembly | print number 4194a |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-02-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06143 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - referred to transportation