NY A04186 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - signed chap.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - signed chap.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the canvassing of primary returns by the board of elections.
Title
Relates to the canvassing of primary returns by the board of elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | signed chap.42 |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-04-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-04-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.151 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2580 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.171 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.35 |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02580 (Same As) 2016-04-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4186