NY A04163 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey an abandoned state armory to the Bay Shore union free school district.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to convey an abandoned state armory to the Bay Shore union free school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | Senate | signed chap.156 |
2011-07-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.832 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2635A |
2011-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.103 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.103 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | print number 4163a |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2011-02-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02635 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4163A