NY A04136 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of the term "name" for purposes of designating or nominating a candidate for public office or party position.
Title
Relates to the definition of the term "name" for purposes of designating or nominating a candidate for public office or party position.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s1133 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.174 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01133 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.490