NY A04127 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits third-party food delivery services from charging a food service establishment a delivery fee that totals more than a certain percent of the total purchase price of an online order.
Title
Prohibits third-party food delivery services from charging a food service establishment a delivery fee that totals more than a certain percent of the total purchase price of an online order.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | print number 4127b |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | print number 4127a |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01554 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES