NY A04082 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance policies and contracts shall provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of lymphedema; and requires such coverage shall include benefits for equipment, supplies, devices, complex decongestive therapy and out-patient self management training and education for the treatment of lymphedema.
Title
Requires health insurance policies and contracts shall provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of lymphedema; and requires such coverage shall include benefits for equipment, supplies, devices, complex decongestive therapy and out-patient self management training and education for the treatment of lymphedema.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | print number 4082a |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03474 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3474A