NY A04067 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state liquor authority to make available on its automated public license query website and database information pertaining to any conditions it imposes on a licensed premises.
Title
Requires the state liquor authority to make available on its automated public license query website and database information pertaining to any conditions it imposes on a licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.590 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00343 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS