NY A04051 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - print number 4051b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - print number 4051b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain parcels of land containing the Smith Opera House from licensing restrictions prohibiting manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers of alcoholic beverages from sharing an interest in a licensed premises.
Title
Exempts certain parcels of land containing the Smith Opera House from licensing restrictions prohibiting manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers of alcoholic beverages from sharing an interest in a licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Assembly | print number 4051b |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | print number 4051a |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04999 (Same As) 2024-05-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING