NY A03963 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ensuring fairness in the value of gifted goods.
Title
Relates to ensuring fairness in the value of gifted goods.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.301 |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.513 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |