NY A03963 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - advanced to third reading cal.600
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - advanced to third reading cal.600
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions to preserve access to health care services by requiring that applications for construction not be approved unless the commissioner affirmatively finds that access to health care services will be preserved.
Title
Makes provisions to preserve access to health care services by requiring that applications for construction not be approved unless the commissioner affirmatively finds that access to health care services will be preserved.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.600 |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | print number 3963a |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to health |