NY A03929 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that individuals have the ability to vote by absentee ballot in certain elections where their maximum sentence of imprisonment has expired.
Title
Clarifies that individuals have the ability to vote by absentee ballot in certain elections where their maximum sentence of imprisonment has expired.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.783 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S08617 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION