NY A03887 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - print number 3887b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - print number 3887b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Westchester county to require bidders for public works, construction or purchase contracts to hire and retain persons residing in certain targeted communities.
Title
Allows Westchester county to require bidders for public works, construction or purchase contracts to hire and retain persons residing in certain targeted communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Assembly | print number 3887b |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-04-13 | Assembly | print number 3887a |
2018-04-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03489 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 3489B