NY A03842 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.374
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the military family relief fund and provides taxpayers a method by which they may contribute to the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the military family relief fund and provides taxpayers a method by which they may contribute to the fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.374
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2137
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S9044
2018-05-31SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2018-05-31Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.945
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-04-20Assemblyprint number 3842a
2018-04-20Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-01-30Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S09044 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3842A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03842&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03842&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03842
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03842&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03842A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03842&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03842&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A3842#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback