NY A03826 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - RECOMMITTED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - RECOMMITTED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all advertisements for gambling and sports betting to include warnings about potential harmful and addictive effects of gambling; requires the state gaming commission to cooperate with the commissioner of addiction services and supports to ensure that all advertisements for gaming activity state a problem gambling hotline number.
Title
Requires all advertisements for gambling and sports betting to include warnings about potential harmful and addictive effects of gambling; requires the state gaming commission to cooperate with the commissioner of addiction services and supports to ensure that all advertisements for gaming activity state a problem gambling hotline number.
Sponsors
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3826b |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-02-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.131 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.108 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.108 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 3826a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S03739 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3739B