NY A03799 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the jurisdictional limit from $3,000 to $5,000 for justice courts and increases filing fees.
Title
Increases the jurisdictional limit from $3,000 to $5,000 for justice courts and increases filing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | print number 3799a |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05951 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY