NY A03749 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on or after January 1, 1973 to receive high school diplomas.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to develop a program for veterans who served on or after January 1, 1973 to receive high school diplomas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | referred to education |