NY A03722 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state War of 1812 200th anniversary commemoration commission to promote the 200th anniversary of the War of 1812 by planning and executing an organized series of War of 1812 reenactment tourism events.
Title
Establishes the New York state War of 1812 200th anniversary commemoration commission to promote the 200th anniversary of the War of 1812 by planning and executing an organized series of War of 1812 reenactment tourism events.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Asm. John Ceretto [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | tabled |
2011-09-23 | Senate | vetoed memo.57 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1309 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4025A |
2011-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.380 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-11 | Assembly | print number 3722a |
2011-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-26 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S04025 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3722A